MA S915 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to workers' compensation insurance
Title
Relative to workers’ compensation insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Pending Senate Ways and Means amendment adoped |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Postponed to Thursday, April 26th, 2012 |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Read second |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 12, 2012 |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S915 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11581&generalCourtId=1 |