MA S914 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2753

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the addition of sex and gender as a protected class category for crime prosecutions. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the addition of sex and gender as a protected class category for crime prosecutions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2753
2024-04-16HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-28SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-11-28JointHearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1536 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred
H1537 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S2753 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback