MA S897 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit falsification or impersonation of an emergency medical technician or paramedic. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting falsification or impersonation of an emergency medical technician and/or paramedic
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3608 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S897 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S897.pdf |