MA S895 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reform the judicial system. The Judiciary.
Title
Reforming chapter 43B rule 66
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1342 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2354
S1640 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2170 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1640 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2170 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S895 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S895.pdf |