MA S889 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to transformative development initiatives in rural communities. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transformative development initiatives in rural communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-11SenateAmendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
2024-07-11SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-16HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-05SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-04HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-01-29JointHearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S1977 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S232 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2613
H3102 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback