MA S876 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent the cruel and inhumane treatment of animals. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to a private cause of action to prevent the cruel and inhumane treatment of animals
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Montigny [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 and A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S767 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1017 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1699 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2463 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Resolved passed and laid before the Governor
S786 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H896 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
S767 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1017 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1699 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2463 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Resolved passed and laid before the Governor
S786 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H896 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S876 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S876.pdf |