MA S862 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit falsification or impersonation of an emergency medical technician or paramedic. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting falsification or impersonation of an emergency medical technician and/or paramedic
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Rep. Theodore Speliotis [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-07-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S762 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1296 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1623 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S1399 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S709 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1984
H1296 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1623 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S1399 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S709 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1984
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S862 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S862.pdf |