MA S857 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure continued rights for public housing residents. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring continued rights for public housing residents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-15HouseHouse concurred
2024-07-11SenateAmendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
2024-07-11SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-16HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-05SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-04HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-05JointHearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S249 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2807
S740 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1340 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - House concurred
S2807 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback