MA S854 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require recordkeeping at public construction worksites in order to protect first responders. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Requiring recordkeeping at public construction worksites in order to protect first responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2013 from 12:30 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S854 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S854.pdf |