MA S853 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to district court jurisdiction of threats to use deadly weapons, explosives, chemical or biological agents, or other devices or substances capable of causing death, serious bodily injury or substantial property damage. The Judiciary.
Title
Regarding district court jurisdiction of threats to use deadly weapons, explosives, chemical or biological agents, or other devices or substances capable of causing death, serious bodily injury or substantial property damage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-11-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3402 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3345 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3315 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H817 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3345 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3315 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H817 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S853 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S853.pdf |