MA S84 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to universal basic income. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to universal basic income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2533 |
2019-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H414 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
S65 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S326 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2046 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1316 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2686
H1999 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H1233 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2136 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2533 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H414 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
S65 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S326 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2046 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1316 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2686
H1999 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H1233 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2136 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2533 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S84 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S84.pdf |