MA S819 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Accompanied H1257
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Accompanied H1257
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to tuition waivers for children raised by a grandparent or other relative. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to tuition waivers for children raised by a grandparent or other relative
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] |
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Accompanied H1257 |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1257 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S819 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S819.pdf |