MA S812 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to parental choice of terminology in certain domestic relations matters. The Judiciary.
Title
Relating to parental choice of terminology in certain domestic relations matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S52 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S812 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S812.pdf |