MA S789 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect certain persons rendering emergency care from liability. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to providing a safe harbor for good samaritans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-10-27JointHearing scheduled for 11/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S1142 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S2087 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3044 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
H1285 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S1226 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1012 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback