MA S780 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3929

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3929
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to address the overuse of temporary nursing service agencies at Massachusetts skilled nursing facilities. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To address the overuse of temporary nursing service agencies at Massachusetts skilled nursing facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-30HouseAccompanied H3929
2023-06-05JointHearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-05-30JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H3929 (Replaced by) 2023-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4178
H1166 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3929
S2514 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4322 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4155 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2821 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback