MA S78 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the miracle league of Massachusetts to provide recreational resources for persons with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing the miracle league of Massachusetts
Sponsors
Sen. James Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S76 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S52 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H2100 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S76 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S52 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H2100 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S78 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S78.pdf |