MA S779 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to parole. The Judiciary.
Title
Related to parole
Sponsors
Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S949 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3110 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2302 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2301 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3494 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2562 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3110 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2302 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2301 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3494 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2562 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S779 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S779.pdf |