MA S759 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-24 - Read; and referred to Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-24 - Read; and referred to Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the proximity of storage facilites utilized in possession of land or tenement cases. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the proximity of storage facilities utilized in possession of land or tenement cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-24 | Senate | Read; and referred to Senate Ways and Means |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Motion to substitute bill for the report of the committee prevailed |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-06-27 | House | House concurred |
2012-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, July 13, 2012 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-04-09 | House | House concurred |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012 |
2012-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2012 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S759 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12726&generalCourtId=1 |