MA S758 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4634

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide access to patient protection services for MassHealth consumers. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing access to patient protection services for MassHealth consumers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4634
2023-10-03JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H2240 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Reported, in part, by H962

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback