MA S756 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2499
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to protecting free speech through the anti-slaap law. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to protecting free speech through the anti-slaap law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2499 |
2018-04-02 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | House concurred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday, March 21, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S787 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
S2499 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2499 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S756 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S756.pdf |