MA S753 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1987
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S1987
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S1987
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide access to forensic and scientific analysis
Title
Providing access to forensic and scientific analysis
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Gloria Fox [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S1987 |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Read second |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting thereof a new draft, see S1987 |
2011-07-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
S1987 (Replaced by) 2012-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S753 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14601&generalCourtId=1 |