MA S741 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2232

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent animal cruelty. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent farm animal cruelty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-30SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2232
2014-04-03SenateSenate concurred
2014-03-20HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
2013-07-09JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2013-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2013-01-22SenateReferred to the Senate Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2232 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback