MA S728 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the penalty for vandalism. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the penalty for vandalism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #280 [YEAS 28 - NAYS 7] |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read third |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Ross) rejected |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ross) rejected - Roll Call #279 [YEAS 8 - NAYS 27] |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read second |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S627 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1972
S697 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1116 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2279
S625 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2346 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S764 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S440 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2241
H1600 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2015
S1900 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2241 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2279 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
S888 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1717 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1731 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S697 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1116 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2279
S625 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2346 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S764 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S440 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2241
H1600 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2015
S1900 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2241 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2279 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
S888 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1717 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1731 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S728 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S728.pdf |