MA S709 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2487
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Finish Line Scholarship Program. Higher Education.
Title
Establishing the Finish Line Scholarship Program
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2487 |
2017-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Westfield State University |
2017-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Leominster High School |
2017-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S712 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S710 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1590 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S680 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2247
H3491 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H3004 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4512
H1582 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S710 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1590 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S680 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2247
H3491 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H3004 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4512
H1582 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S709 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S709.pdf |