MA S699 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to Medicare savings programs eligibility. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding Medicare savings programs eligibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-06-28JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H806 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1622 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S683 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1477 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S1559 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S624 (Similar To) 2019-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1194 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback