MA S69 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2411
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the safety of disabled individuals living in group homes. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To increase the safety of disabled individuals living in group homes
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
Rep. Thomas Calter [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2411 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1502 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2411 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied S2213
S2411 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied S2213
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S69 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S69.pdf |