MA S689 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the rights of faculty members at the University of Massachusetts. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the rights of faculty members at the University of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2487 |
2017-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S679 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S1376 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S686 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S85 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2236 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4153
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1376 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S686 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S85 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2236 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4153
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S689 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S689.pdf |