MA S688 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2034
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts Uniform Trust Code. The Judiciary.
Title
To establish the Massachusetts Uniform Trust Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2034 |
2011-05-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2011 from 01:00 PM-10:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
S2034 (Replaced by) 2012-03-08 - New draft substituted, see S2128
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S688 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11740&generalCourtId=1 |