MA S679 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to newborn enrollment in MassHealth. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to newborn enrollment in MassHealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H598 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H35 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5039
H1161 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S50 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S661 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2194 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H35 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5039
H1161 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S50 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S661 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2194 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S679 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S679.pdf |