MA S674 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure quality education and training programs. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to ensuring quality education and training programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2487 |
2017-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S281 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S688 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S372 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1703 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S688 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S372 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1703 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S2487 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S674 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S674.pdf |