MA S667 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4180

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to repeal mandatory minimum sentences for non-violent drug offenses. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To repeal mandatory minimum sentences for non-violent drug offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-11HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4180
2014-04-17JointHearing scheduled for 04/24/2014 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2014-04-03SenateSenate concurred
2014-03-20HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
2013-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2013-01-22SenateReferred to the Senate Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4180 (Replaced by) 2014-06-16 - Reported, in part, by H1486

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback