MA S667 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2440

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to additional fees on criminal cases. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a surcharge on criminal cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-15SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2440
2012-06-27HouseHouse concurred
2012-06-27HouseRules suspended
2012-06-21SenateReporting date extended to Friday, July 13, 2012
2012-06-21SenateRules suspended
2012-05-14HouseHouse concurred
2012-05-03SenateReporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012
2012-05-03SenateRules suspended
2012-04-09HouseHouse concurred
2012-03-29SenateReporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012
2012-03-29SenateRules suspended
2011-07-01JointHearing scheduled for 07/06/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2011-01-24HouseHouse concurred
2011-01-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2440 (Replaced by) 2012-10-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback