MA S660 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the care and treatment of patients with mitochondrial disease. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the care and treatment of patients with mitochondrial disease
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4634 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S660 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S660.pdf |