MA S658 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to dual diagnosis treatment coverage. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to dual diagnosis treatment coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-04-28 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1269 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H1988 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied S1269
H1141 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4879
H1988 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied S1269
H1141 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4879
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S658 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S658.pdf |