MA S650 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2636
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to notify broker prior to termination of coverage. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to notifying broker prior to termination of coverage
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
Rep. Christopher Flanagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2636 |
2023-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4096 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2636 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4410 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4411 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2636 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4410 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4411 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S650 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S650.pdf |