MA S646 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to supportive care for serious mental illness. Financial Services.
Title
For supportive care for serious mental illness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied by H1062 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1062 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S646
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S646 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S646.pdf |