MA S643 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2636

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require certain healthcare carriers to share accountability with providers for uncollectible patient obligations after insurance. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to uncollected co-pays, co-insurance and deductibles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2636
2023-08-29JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2636 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4581 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4643 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Published as amended, see H4653
H4757 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4828 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Adopted, in concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback