MA S613 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to community behavioral health centers. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to community behavioral health centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H146 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H1108 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1979 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2678 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1108 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1979 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2678 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S613 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S613.pdf |