MA S607 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to insurance coverage and access to nurse-midwifery services. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase access to nurse-midwifery services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-04-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-28HouseReporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2023-08-29JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1069 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Senate concurred
H4096 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4410 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4411 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback