MA S601 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, S1787
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, S1787
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the need for accessible homes for the elderly, returning veterans with disabilities, and families that include persons with disabilities. Housing.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the need for accessible homes for the elderly, returning veterans with disabilities, and families that include persons with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, S1787 |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S601 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S601.pdf |