MA S580 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2168
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide full student representation on the Univeristy of Massachusetts Board of Trustees. Higher Education.
Title
Providing full student representation on the Univeristy of Massachusetts Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2168 |
2013-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2013 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2168 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S580 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S580.pdf |