MA S58 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide equal access to evaluations for children with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Providing equal access to evaluations for children with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2535 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-11-02 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-12-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/17 from 12:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S699 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H89 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H634 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4286
H291 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H89 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H634 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4286
H291 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S58 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S58.pdf |