MA S576 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to motor vehicle service contracts. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to motor vehicle service contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-04HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1087 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Senate concurred
S625 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback