MA S575 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2284
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow veterans to pay in-state tuition and fees at state or community colleges. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to access to higher education for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2284 |
2011-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2011 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2284 (Replaced by) 2012-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S575 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9641&generalCourtId=1 |