MA S56 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H101
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-05 - Accompanied H101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-05 - Accompanied H101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to assess the impact of the public welfare system on the health and well-being of children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To assess the impact of the public welfare system on the health and well-being of children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-05 | House | Accompanied H101 |
2013-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H101 (Replaced by) 2013-12-05 - Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S56 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S56.pdf |