MA S554 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4263

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require producer responsibility for the collection, reuse and recycling of discarded electronic products. Environment and Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require producer responsibility for collection, reuse and recycling of discarded electronic products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-18HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4263
2023-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

H4263 (Replaced by) 2024-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H871 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback