MA S540 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2121
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide coverage for tobacco use cessation under Commonwealth Care. Health Care Financing.
Title
To provide for tobacco cessation benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2121 |
2011-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S2121 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S540 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14034&generalCourtId=1 |