MA S536 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H991
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the use of crossbows in hunting. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of crossbows in hunting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24HouseAccompanied H991
2021-12-28JointHearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H991 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1024 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H991
H4442 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback