MA S534 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the remediation of home heating oil releases. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the remediation of home heating oil releases
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S422 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H425 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H1760 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H425 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H1760 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S534 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S534.pdf |