MA S53 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied H75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied H75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to familial dysautonomia. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to familial dysautonomia
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied H75 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-11-02 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-12-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/17 from 12:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H75 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1667 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1667 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S53 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S53.pdf |